CO HB1349 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a new excise tax related to firearms, and, in connection therewith, contingent on voter approval of the new tax and the retention by the state of all revenue generated by the new tax at the 2024 general election, levying an excise tax on the net taxable sales of gun dealers, gun manufacturers, and ammunition vendors from the retail sale in this state of any firearm, firearm precursor part, or ammunition, requiring the excise tax revenue to be spent for mental health services, including for at-risk youth and military veterans, school safety and gun violence prevention, and support services for victims of domestic violence and other violent crimes, and making an appropriation.
Title
Firearms & Ammunition Excise Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1349, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1349, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment G). (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1349, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1349, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1349, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment G). (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1349, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2024-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-17 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-01 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |