CO HB1431 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-04 - Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-04 - Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of a program to provide stable housing assistance for survivors of abuse, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Stable Housing for Survivors of Abuse Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1431 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1431 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1431, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1431, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1431 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1431 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1431, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1431, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1431 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2024-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-24 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-09 | House | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-03-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |