CO HB1450 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the nonsubstantive revision of statutes in the Colorado Revised Statutes, as amended, and, in connection therewith, amending or repealing obsolete, imperfect, and inoperative law to preserve the legislative intent, effect, and meaning of the law.
Title
Revisor's Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1450 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1450, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1450, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1450 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1450, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1450, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-04-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-20 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-18 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-16 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |