CO SB009 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit Referral Fees When Dividing Dental Fees
Title
Prohibit Referral Fees When Dividing Dental Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-009 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-009 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-009, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and place on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-009 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-009 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-009, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and place on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-02-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-02-17 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-02-16 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-02-09 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |