CO SB009 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the right of consumers of electricity to interconnect energy storage systems for use on their property.
Title
Allow Electric Utility Customers Install Energy Storage Equipment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-009 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-009, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.008. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-009, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-009 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-009, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.008. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-009, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Governor Signed | |
2018-03-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-03-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-02 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/05/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-28 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/01/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-27 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 02/28/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-26 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |