CO SB011 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning permanent authorization for third-party providers to perform vehicle identification number verification inspections for commercial vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial Vehicle VIN Vehicle Identification Number Verification Inspections

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 20-011 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-011 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05 Governor Signed
2020-02-27 Sent to the Governor
2020-02-27HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-02-27SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-02-18HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-14HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-11HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-31HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government
2020-01-30SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-01-29SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-01-23SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-01-08SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-011
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_011_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_011_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_011_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_011_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_011_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_011_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d62c35a942b143bb872584f8005a3ec9-sb20-011-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-011vote5999ae
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-011vote5906f8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ee93b89f47cda1aa8725850b0067504f-sb20-011-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-011vote5a9f19

Bill Comments

feedback