CO SB019 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 12/25/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 12/25/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of the legislative oversight committee concerning tax policy.
Title
Legislative Oversight Committee Concerning Tax Policy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-019, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-019, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-019, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-019, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-019, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-019, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-019, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 12/25/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |