CO SB025 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 22 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 22 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning local government sales and use taxes administered by the department of revenue, and, in connection therewith, revising, modernizing, and harmonizing various state statutes relating to the state-administration of local sales and use tax into one uniform statute.
Title
Update Local Government Sales & UseTax Collection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-025 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-025, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment F). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment G). (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-025, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-025 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-025, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment F). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment G). (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-025, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-04-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-04-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-05 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-04 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |