CO SB043 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a correction to the rate of reimbursement that an out-of-network health care provider is entitled to receive from a health insurance carrier for services provided to a covered person at an in-network facility when the health care provider submits a claim to the carrier within the specified time period to conform with existing law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Out-of-network Provider Reimbursement Rate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 20-043 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-043 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11 Governor Signed
2020-03-04 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-03SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-02-27HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-24HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-21HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-18HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-02-06HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance
2020-02-04SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-03SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-01-29SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-01-08SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-043
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_043_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_043_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_043_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_043_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_043_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_043_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bdb194ecb807034b872584fe005c9f47-sb20-043-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-043vote67178d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/de32adb08d6fa782872585120061a1c5-sb20-043-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-043vote5a9d1b

Bill Comments

feedback