DC B25-0611 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on November 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Public Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Public Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-611 would reduce the building restriction line along the southern side of Fern Street, NW on Lots 847, 12 973, 1016 to 1033, and 1062 to 1072 in Square 2950 from 15 feet to 9.5 feet.
Title
Adjustment of Building Restriction Line in Square 2950 along the southern side of Fern Street NW, S.R. 23-06301 Act of 2023
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-23 | Council | Public Hearing |
2024-04-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-04-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-12-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0611 Published in the DC Register |
2023-12-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2023-11-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0611 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/54389/Introduction/B25-0611-Introduction.pdf |