CO SB069 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures to clarify individualized education program information through a publicly available training program, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Clarify Individualized Education Program Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-069 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-069, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-069, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-069, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-069, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-069, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-069, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-069, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-069, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-04-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |