CO SB071 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning including seasonal outdoor adventure day camp programs in the definition of children's resident camps.
Title
Seasonal Outdoor Adventure Day Camp Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-071 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-071 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-071 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-071 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Governor Signed | |
2024-03-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-03-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |