CO SB086 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning requirements associated with the expiration of legal authority to sell alcohol beverages, and, in connection therewith, authorizing the executive director of the department of revenue to notify alcohol beverage licensees of an expiring license by any reasonable means as determined by rule and to establish a fee for renewal applications for license or permit renewals for alcohol beverages and fermented malt beverages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcohol Beverage License And Permit Expiration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 20-086 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 20-086 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23 Governor Signed
2020-03-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-17 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-10HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-09HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-04HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-02-06HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor
2020-02-04SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-03SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-01-29SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-01-13SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-086
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_086_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_086_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_086_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_086_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_086_rr2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_086_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/70dd69f185765bc4872584fe00778b1d-sb20-086-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-086vote6717a0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/dadde89372016e498725852100788162-sb20-086-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-086vote542c3e

Bill Comments

feedback