CO SB095 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-04 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-04 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures to address ozone levels in areas that do not meet federal ozone national ambient air quality standards, and, in connection therewith, enacting incentive-based ozone precursor emissions reduction measures for on-road mobile sources and for lawn equipment, conducting annual photochemical modeling studies and data analysis, and making an appropriation.
Title
Air Quality Ozone Levels
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-095, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.017 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-095, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-095, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 24-095, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.012 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.011 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 24-095, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-095, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.017 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-095, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-095, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 24-095, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.012 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.011 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 24-095, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Finance |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |