CO SB096 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-9)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-9)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning policies relating to in-state tuition classification at state-supported institutions of higher education.
Title
In-State Tuition Classification Institution Of Higher Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 23-096, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 23-096, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 23-096, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 23-096, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | Governor Signed | |
2023-04-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-04-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2023-03-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-17 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-03-15 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |