CO SB108 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Enrolled on April 23 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 23 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a prohibition on affiliating with a public safety radio network without authorization.
Title
Prohibit Unauthorized Use Public Safety Radio
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-108 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 24-108 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-108 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 24-108 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-04-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-16 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-15 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/14/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-05 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |