CO SB119 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-11 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-11 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify Title Ins Certificate Of Tax Reqmnt
Title
Clarify Title Ins Certificate Of Tax Reqmnt
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Jones [D] | Sen. Ray Scott [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-119 to the Committee of the Whole. Representative Gardner renewed his motion (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-119 to the Committee of the Whole. Representative Gardner renewed his motion (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Substitute motion to refer Senate Bill 13-119 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A). Representative Gardner spoke in opposition to the amendment. Representative Singer discussed his reason for the amendment. A substitute motion was offered. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Substitute motion to refer Senate Bill 13-119 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A). Representative Gardner spoke in opposition to the amendment. Representative Singer discussed his reason for the amendment. A substitute motion was offered. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SB 13-119 to the Committee of the Whole, unamended, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SB 13-119 to the Committee of the Whole, unamended, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-119 to the Committee of the Whole. Representative Gardner renewed his motion (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Substitute motion to refer Senate Bill 13-119 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A). Representative Gardner spoke in opposition to the amendment. Representative Singer discussed his reason for the amendment. A substitute motion was offered. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Substitute motion to refer Senate Bill 13-119 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A). Representative Gardner spoke in opposition to the amendment. Representative Singer discussed his reason for the amendment. A substitute motion was offered. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SB 13-119 to the Committee of the Whole, unamended, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SB 13-119 to the Committee of the Whole, unamended, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-11 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-04-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-08 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-03 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-27 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-21 | House | House Committee on Local Government Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |