CO SB160 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Parent Involvement In Education
Title
Parent Involvement In Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.004 (Attachment C). The original motion and the second of the motion were withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-160 to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.004 (Attachment C). The original motion and the second of the motion were withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-160 to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-160, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.002 (Attachment F) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.002 (Attachment F) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-160, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-160 to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.004 (Attachment C). The original motion and the second of the motion were withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-160 to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-160, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.002 (Attachment F) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.002 (Attachment F) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-160, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-24 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-05-08 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-27 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-04-25 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2012-04-23 | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-04-12 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education | |
2012-04-10 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-04 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-04-03 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-03-19 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |