CO SB160 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning programs to preserve mobile home communities, and, in connection therewith, establishing a revolving loan and grant program to assist mobile home owners seeking to purchase their communities, and making an appropriation.
Title
Loan Program Resident-owned Communities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-160 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 22-160 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-160, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-160, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 22-160 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-160 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 22-160 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-160, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-160, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 22-160 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-04 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-05-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-03 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-02 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-04-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/20/2022 - No Amendments |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |