CO SB222 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a grant program for small businesses affected by economic hardship caused by the COVID-19 pandemic that is financed by money received from the federal government pursuant to the "CARES Act", and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Use CARES Act Money Small Business Grant Program
Sponsors
Sen. Faith Winter [D] | Sen. Jeff Bridges [D] | Rep. Mary Young [D] | Sen. Perry Will [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-222, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-222, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-222, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-222 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-222, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-222, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-222, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-222 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-06-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-12 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-06-11 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |