CO SB234 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-10 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-10 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Prepay Moneys To FPPA Old Hire Pension Plans
Title
State Prepay Moneys To FPPA Old Hire Pension Plans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moves that the Senate secede and adopt the House version (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moves that the Senate secede and adopt the House version (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-234 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-234 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-234 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-234 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moves that the Senate secede and adopt the House version (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-234 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-234 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-234 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-234 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-10 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Recede |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-04-10 | Senate | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2013-04-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-04 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |