CO SB253 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning specifying that the department of education is not a state agency for purposes of the office of information technology.
Title
Exempt CDE Department Of Education From Office Of Information Technology
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-253 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-253 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-253 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-253 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |