CO SJR022 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-10 - House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-10 - House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Conflict Resolution Month
Title
Conflict Resolution Month
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Newell [D] | Sen. Pete Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/08/2015 - No Amendments |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |