CT HB05004 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require insurers to disclose to certain employers upon request certain claims data.
Title
An Act Concerning Transparency In Health Insurance Claims Data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 420 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-05-27 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2010-05-25 | Public Act 10-163 | |
2010-05-05 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-01 | File Number 682 | |
2010-05-01 | Senate Calendar Number 531 | |
2010-05-01 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-30 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |
2010-04-30 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-04-30 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4029 | |
2010-04-28 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-28 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2010-04-28 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-28 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-28 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-27 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2010-04-15 | File Number 553 | |
2010-04-15 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-15 | New File by Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-15 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-09 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-04-08 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-07 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-03-31 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-03-11 | File Number 11 | |
2010-03-11 | House Calendar Number 30 | |
2010-03-11 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-03-11 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-05 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/10/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-02-24 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-02-23 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-02-11 | Public Hearing 02/18 | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |