CT HB05181 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - File Number 54
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - File Number 54
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Department of Education to conduct a study of public education in Connecticut.
Title
An Act Concerning Public Education In The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | File Number 54 |
2024-03-20 | House | House Calendar Number 66 |
2024-03-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-06 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-17 | House | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2024-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |