CT HB05270 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the threshold dollar amount for misdemeanor and felony unemployment compensation fraud.
Title
An Act Increasing The Threshold Amount For Felony Unemployment Compensation Fraud.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-05 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-04-02 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-20 | House | File Number 62 |
2024-03-20 | House | House Calendar Number 74 |
2024-03-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |