CT HB05339 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - File Number 192
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - File Number 192
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit institutions of higher education from considering the school disciplinary history of an applicant during the admissions process.
Title
An Act Prohibiting The Consideration Of School Disciplinary History During The Admissions Process At An Institution Of Higher Education.
Sponsors
House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee | Rep. Robyn Porter [D] | Rep. Anthony Nolan [D] | Rep. Anne Hughes [D] |
Sen. Herron Gaston [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | File Number 192 |
2024-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 159 |
2024-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2024-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |