CT HB05404 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-13 - Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Environment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-13 - Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Environment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To allow soup swaps at farmers' markets.
Title
An Act Authorizing Farmers' Markets To Conduct Soup Swaps.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-13 | House | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Environment |
2015-02-13 | House | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Environment |
2015-02-11 | House | Change of Reference Environment |
2015-01-26 | House | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health |
2015-01-26 | House | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health |
2015-01-23 | House | Change of Reference Public Health |
2015-01-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
Connecticut State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB05404&which_year=2015 |
Text | http://www.cga.ct.gov/2015/TOB/H/2015HB-05404-R00-HB.htm |