CT HB05411 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - File Number 514
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - File Number 514
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish time and cost parameters relating to requests for health records.
Title
An Act Concerning Requests For Health Records And The Fees Charged For Access To Such Records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | File Number 514 |
2024-04-16 | House | House Calendar Number 352 |
2024-04-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-01 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-14 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2024-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |