CT HB05424 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-6-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-6-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To allow two or more boards of education to jointly purchase health insurance for their employees.
Title
An Act Concerning Agreements Between Municipalities And Boards Of Education For The Joint Purchase Of Employee Health Insurance And The Disclosure Of Certain Information Regarding Compensation For Services Provided By Insurance Producers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 417 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-08 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-05-27 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2010-05-25 | Public Act 10-174 | |
2010-05-05 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-04-30 | File Number 681 | |
2010-04-30 | Senate Calendar Number 521 | |
2010-04-30 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-29 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |
2010-04-29 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-04-29 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3920 | |
2010-04-14 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-14 | No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |
2010-04-14 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-14 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-14 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-13 | Referred by House to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |
2010-04-06 | File Number 327 | |
2010-04-06 | House Calendar Number 183 | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-06 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-29 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 10:00 AM | |
2010-03-22 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-19 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-03-04 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |
2010-03-03 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |