CT HB05436 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - File Number 369
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - File Number 369
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To revise and update the laws governing teacher certification.
Title
An Act Concerning Educator Certification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 32 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | File Number 369 |
2024-04-09 | House | House Calendar Number 244 |
2024-04-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-02 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |