CT HB05441 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - File Number 370
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - File Number 370
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To permit utility shutoffs for customers who have the resources to pay their utility bills but currently cannot have their service terminated due to illness.
Title
An Act Concerning Utility Shutoffs For Certain Customers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | File Number 370 |
2024-04-09 | House | House Calendar Number 245 |
2024-04-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-02 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |