CT HB05455 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-31 - File Number 355
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-31 - File Number 355
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a task force on patients' medical records.
Title
An Act Establishing A Task Force On Patients' Medical Records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | File Number 355 |
2016-03-31 | House | House Calendar Number 249 |
2016-03-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-16 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |