CT HB05455 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - File Number 334
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - File Number 334
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Social Services to study and make recommendations concerning the efficiency of the Department of Social Services in making eligibility determinations for medical assistance and responding to requests for information or assistance.
Title
An Act Concerning The Efficiency Of The Department Of Social Services In Determining Eligibility For Medical Assistance And Responding To Requests For Information Or Assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | File Number 334 |
2024-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 229 |
2024-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |