CT HB05478 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Referred by House to Committee on Commerce
Pending: Joint Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Referred by House to Committee on Commerce
Pending: Joint Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To expand the land value taxation pilot program and authorize the Community Investment Fund Board 2030 to provide grants-in-aid for certain projects.
Title
An Act Concerning The Land Value Taxation Pilot Program.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Rep. Aundre Bumgardner [R] | Rep. Jennifer Leeper [D] | Rep. Anthony Nolan [D] |
Rep. Jane Garibay [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-22 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Commerce |
2024-04-10 | House | File Number 422 |
2024-04-10 | House | House Calendar Number 278 |
2024-04-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |