CT HB05491 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-25-1)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - File Number 561
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - File Number 561
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a property tax exemption for veterans who have a service-connected permanent and total disability rating as determined by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs.
Title
An Act Establishing A Property Tax Exemption For Veterans Who Have A Service-connected Permanent And Total Disability Rating.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | File Number 561 |
2024-04-18 | House | House Calendar Number 381 |
2024-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-03 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-02 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-15 | House | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |