CT HB05515 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - File Number 599
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - File Number 599
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) establish a Municipal Employees Retirement Commission, (2) provide for the crediting of employment of a municipal retiree who accepts employment from a municipality that is not participating in the municipal employees' retirement system, and (3) require the Comptroller to create a municipal defined contribution retirement plan.
Title
An Act Establishing The Municipal Employees Retirement Commission And Concerning The Municipal Employees' Retirement System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | File Number 599 |
2024-04-22 | House | House Calendar Number 414 |
2024-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/24 12:00 PM |
2024-04-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-03 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-28 | House | Public Hearing 04/01 |
2024-03-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |