CT HB05627 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To allow children, stepchildren and other dependent children to retain dental insurance coverage under their parents' insurance policies until they attain the age of twenty-six or obtain substitute coverage through an employer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Extending The Period A Child, Stepchild Or Other Dependent Child May Retain Dental Insurance Coverage Under A Parent's Health Insurance Policy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-14HouseNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-14HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-13HouseJoint Favorable
2019-05-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-02HouseFile Number 275
2019-04-02HouseHouse Calendar Number 181
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-02HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/05
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
2019-02-27HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-01-24HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback