CT HB05682 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Senate Calendar Number 531
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Senate Calendar Number 531
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To redefine "manufacturer" to exclude a person constructing or assembling any trailer with a gross vehicle weight rating of ten thousand pounds or less.
Title
An Act Concerning Businesses That Construct Trailers With A Gross Vehicle Weight Rating Of Ten Thousand Pounds Or Less.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 199 (Y: 146 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Calendar Number 531 |
2017-05-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-23 | House | House Passed |
2017-04-05 | House | File Number 421 |
2017-04-05 | House | House Calendar Number 294 |
2017-04-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-17 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |
2017-03-15 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-01-26 | House | Public Hearing 01/30 |
2017-01-23 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |