CT HB05850 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require health insurance coverage for the purchase of service animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring Health Insurance Coverage For The Purchase Of Service Animals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseFavorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-20HouseFavorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-20HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations
2019-03-08HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
2019-03-07HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-28HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-07HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-01-31HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback