CT HB06169 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To reduce the financial strain on grandparents and other nonparent relatives raising needy children.
Title
An Act Increasing Financial Assistance For Grandparents And Other Nonparent Relatives Raising Needy Children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-05 | House | File Number 11 |
2019-03-05 | House | House Calendar Number 22 |
2019-03-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/04/19 5:00 PM |
2019-02-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-02-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-05 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |