CT HB06185 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - File Number 338
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - File Number 338
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To expand the regional performance incentive program to include proposals for regional marketing and economic development.
Title
An Act Expanding The Regional Performance Incentive Program To Include Proposals For Regional Marketing And Economic Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | File Number 338 |
2019-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 216 |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |
2019-03-15 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |