CT HB06217 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - File Number 133
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - File Number 133
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require charitable organizations to disclose their registration numbers and certain financial information when soliciting funds.
Title
An Act Increasing Transparency For Charitable Organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | File Number 133 |
2021-03-25 | House | House Calendar Number 127 |
2021-03-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-09 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |
2021-03-02 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2021-02-09 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |