CT HB06335 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - File Number 823
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - File Number 823
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To streamline the process involving withdrawal or settlement of a land use appeal.
Title
An Act Concerning Land Use Appeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-12 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | File Number 823 |
2019-04-29 | House | House Calendar Number 521 |
2019-04-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-12 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |