CT HB06393 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - File Number 340
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - File Number 340
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To: (1) Automatically cancel a surety bail bond agent's license if the agent does not pay an annual examination fee; (2) reschedule an annual transfer to the General Fund from the surety bail bond agent examination account; and (3) authorize the Insurance Commissioner to adopt regulations concerning continuing education requirements for surety bail bond agents.
Title
An Act Concerning The Insurance Department's Recommendations Regarding Surety Bail Bond Agents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | File Number 340 |
2021-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 256 |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-05 | House | Public Hearing 02/11 |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |