CT HB06404 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-04 - File Number 353
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-04 - File Number 353
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To make technical corrections to the energy statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Technical Revisions To Various Energy Statutes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | File Number 353 | |
2011-04-04 | House Calendar Number 208 | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-04 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-28 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-03-18 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-17 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-02-18 | Public Hearing 02/24 | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |