CT HB06464 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require landlords to be reimbursed for the cost of removing and delivering evicted tenant possessions from the proceeds of a sale at auction of such possessions.
Title
An Act Concerning The Possessions Of Evicted Tenants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-11 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-05-11 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-11 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-10 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-04 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-04-12 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-12 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |
2011-04-12 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-12 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-11 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-06 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | |
2011-03-22 | File Number 147 | |
2011-03-22 | House Calendar Number 100 | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-03-22 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-10 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-10 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-02-25 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |