CT HB06522 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-10-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To permit continuing medical education in risk management to include screening for inflammatory breast cancer and gastrointestinal cancers, including colon, gastric, pancreatic and neuroendocrine cancers and other rare gastrointestinal tumors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Continuing Medical Education In Screening For Inflammatory Breast Cancer And Gastrointestinal Cancers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 325 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 56 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-17HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-17HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-13HousePublic Act 19-45
2019-06-04HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-04HouseSenate Passed
2019-04-25HouseSenate Calendar Number 421
2019-04-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-24HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-09HouseFile Number 555
2019-04-09HouseHouse Calendar Number 337
2019-04-09HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-09HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-25HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-12HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health
2019-03-11HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-03-08HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-20HousePublic Hearing 02/25
2019-02-08HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback