CT HB06671 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - File Number 752
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit changes in address processed at the Department of Motor Vehicles from being transmitted to registrars of voters for the purpose of removing electors from town registry lists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Removal From Voter Registry Lists And The Department Of Motor Vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseFile Number 752
2019-04-18HouseHouse Calendar Number 450
2019-04-18HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-18HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-12HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-02HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-21HousePublic Hearing 03/25
2019-03-19HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2019-03-18HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-06HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback