CT HB06683 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-31 - Senate Calendar Number 633
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-31 - Senate Calendar Number 633
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To name a portion of Route 160 in Rocky Hill in honor of James Vicino.
Title
An Act Regulating Transportation Network Companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 290 AS AMENDED (Y: 130 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-31 | House | Senate Calendar Number 633 |
2015-05-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-30 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2015-05-30 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-30 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8788 |
2015-05-05 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-05 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-05-01 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-04-23 | House | File Number 730 |
2015-04-23 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-23 | House | New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2015-04-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-17 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/15 5:00 PM |
2015-04-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-14 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-04-08 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2015-04-01 | House | File Number 362 |
2015-04-01 | House | House Calendar Number 219 |
2015-04-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-01 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-01-30 | House | Public Hearing 02/06 |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |